NH HB1711 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 15
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 15
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the state to report mental health data for firearms background check purposes and providing for processes for confiscation of firearms following certain mental health-related court proceedings and for relief from mental health-related firearms disabilities.
Title
Authorizing the state to report mental health data for firearms background check purposes and providing for processes for confiscation of firearms following certain mental health-related court proceedings and for relief from mental health-related firearms disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - OTPA (Y: 204 N: 149 NV: 17 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - OTPA (Y: 204 N: 149 NV: 17 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 101 N: 252 NV: 17 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2024-03-28 - House - OTPA (Y: 204 N: 149 NV: 17 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 101 N: 252 NV: 17 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-29 | House | FLAM # 2024-1358h (Rep. Hoell): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 101-252 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0431h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 204-149 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | FLAM # 2024-1350h (Rep. Comtois): Amendment Failed Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-0431h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Lay HB1711 on Table (Rep. Hoell): Motion Failed DV 150-205 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-26 | House | Removed from Consent (Reps. Hoell, T. Mannion, McCarter, Cushman, Jonathan Smith, Prout, Gerhard, D. Kelley, Potenza, Comtois) 03/26/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0431h 03/13/2024 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 10 |
2024-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/23/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-01-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/31/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 87 |