NH HB1755 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an office of the inspector general.
Title
Establishing an office of the inspector general.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Marple [R] | Rep. Ed Comeau [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. James McConnell [R] |
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 41 |
2018-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 23 |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-20 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 22 |