NH HB178 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - House Signed by Governor 06/02/2011; Effective 06/02/2011; Chapter 0119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - House Signed by Governor 06/02/2011; Effective 06/02/2011; Chapter 0119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study issues regarding Financial Resources Mortgage, Inc.
Title
Establishing a committee to study issues regarding Financial Resources Mortgage, Inc.
Sponsors
Sen. John Barnes [R] | Rep. David Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Marshall Quandt [R] |
Rep. Matthew Quandt [R] | Rep. Wyman Shuler [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | House Signed by Governor 06/02/2011; Effective 06/02/2011; Chapter 0119 | |
2011-05-25 | House Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG.1609 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 19, Pg.395 | |
2011-05-18 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1634s (Rep Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1531 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 15, Pg.312 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1634s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 15, Pg.304 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Committee Amendment 1634s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.304 | |
2011-04-28 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1634s, 5/4/11; Senate Calendar 22 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Hearing: 4/28/11, Room 100, State House, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 21 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12, Pg.243 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.752 | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 15 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.546 | |
2011-03-01 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-13 | House Public Hearing: 1/19/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-11 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 175 |