NH HB1795 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 47; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 47; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating the oversight commission on motor vehicle fines.
Title
Eliminating the oversight commission on motor vehicle fines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 47; Eff. 7/14/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Enrolled 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved Laid on Table, Division Vote 7Y-13N, Motion Failed; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing: 03/20/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 58 |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 34 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-12-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 24 |