NH HB213 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to exclusions from the requirement for licensure as a private investigator, bail recovery agent, or security guard.
Title
Relative to exclusions from the requirement for licensure as a private investigator, bail recovery agent, or security guard.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Rodd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 11 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/14/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 5 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 41 |