NH HB213 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB213
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304
Pending: House Science, Technology and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304
Pending: House Science, Technology and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the elimination of useful thermal energy from renewable energy classes.
Title
Relative to the elimination of useful thermal energy from renewable energy classes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-09-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/15/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-06-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 06/21/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98681120846 |
2021-03-10 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96232478698 |
2021-02-25 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/05/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95412375991 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-22 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/22/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following links: 1. 1. To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91732382660 |
2021-02-03 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 02/12/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98218369454 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 39 |
Same As/Similar To
HB213 (Carry Over) 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304