NH HB215 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the legislative body to approve the appointment of town managers and prohibiting town managers from hiring contractors to perform the duties of town managers.
Title
Requiring the legislative body to approve the appointment of town managers and prohibiting town managers from hiring contractors to perform the duties of town managers.
Sponsors
Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. Raymond Howard [R] | Rep. Glen Aldrich [R] | Rep. Chris True [R] |
Rep. Joe Alexander [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 10 |
2019-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/14/2019 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 5 |
2019-02-15 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 41 |