NH HB220 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Effective 07/24/2013; Chapter 0245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Effective 07/24/2013; Chapter 0245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the New Hampshire medal of honor.
Title
Relative to the New Hampshire medal of honor.
Sponsors
Rep. John Graham [R] | Rep. Norman Major [R] | Rep. Robert Theberge [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] |
Rep. Lawrence Kappler [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Effective 07/24/2013; Chapter 0245 |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1714 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Conference Committee Report #2111c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1690 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2111c; Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2013-2111c; Senate Amendment, Filed |
2013-06-12 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/18/13 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Forrester, Bragdon, Lasky |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Moved Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Theberge, Massimilla, McClosky, and Notter [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1650 |
2013-06-12 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1964s and Requests a C of C (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1650 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1964s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1964s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1964s, 6/6/13; Senate Calendar 23 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Hearing: 5/8/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 19 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-13 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.333 |
2013-02-13 | House | Special Order to Beginning of Regular Calendar (Rep Theberge): Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 17, PG.333 |
2013-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 13 (Vote 12-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.215 |
2013-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/31/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 1/24/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.187 |