NH HB221 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/17/2017; Chapter 13; Eff. 6/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/17/2017; Chapter 13; Eff. 6/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the national guard scholarship fund and the New Hampshire national guard education assistance act.
Title
Relative to the national guard scholarship fund and the New Hampshire national guard education assistance act.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Kuch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 04/17/2017; Chapter 13; Eff. 6/16/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Enrolled 04/06/2017 House Journal 13 P. 63 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/06/2017); Senate Journal 14 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/29/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2017, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0209h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 7 |
2017-02-15 | House | Amendment #2017-0209h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 7 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0209h for 02/15/2017 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 8 |
2017-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-12 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/18/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/11/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-12-29 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 21 |