NH HB226 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2291h for Jan 8 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2291h for Jan 8 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the promotion of New Hampshire wines.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the promotion of New Hampshire wines.
Sponsors
Rep. Tara Sad [D] | Rep. Dan McGuire [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2291h for Jan 8 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) |
2013-10-04 | House | ==Rescheduled== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/22/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-10-03 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session Joint with House Enviroment and Agriculture: 10/16/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-09-25 | House | ==Cancelled==Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-09-25 | House | =New Date= Retained Bill-Subcommittee Work Session Joint with House Enviroment and Agriculture: 10/10/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-02-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/5/2013 12:50 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/31/2013 11:05 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2013 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.187 |