NH HB229 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB229
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to requiring an official declaration of war for the activation of the New Hampshire national guard.
Title
Relative to requiring an official declaration of war for the activation of the New Hampshire national guard.
Sponsors
Rep. John Potucek [R] | Rep. Joshua Adjutant [D] | Rep. Matthew Santonastaso [R] | Rep. Michael Granger [R] |
Rep. Tom Mannion [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 187 N: 182 NV: 11 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/18/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 15A |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/09/2024, Room 103, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-01-04 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 47(f) 01/04/2024 House Journal 2 P. 59 |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred to Finance 01/03/2024 House Journal 2 P. 47 |
2024-01-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0045h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 187-182 01/04/2024 House Journal 2 P. 45 |
2024-01-04 | House | FLAM # 2024-0045h (Rep. Pauer): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/04/2024 House Journal 2 P. 44 |
2023-10-27 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 10/11/2023 (Vote 8-11; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 45 |
2023-08-16 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/11/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-08-14 | House | Executive Session: 10/11/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 2 P. 7 |
Same As/Similar To
HB229 (Carry Over) 2023-08-16 - Full Committee Work Session: 10/11/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208