NH HB256 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 47; Eff: 08/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 47; Eff: 08/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing reciprocity for notaries in abutting states.
Title
Establishing reciprocity for notaries in abutting states.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 47; Eff: 08/04/2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0098h: Motion Adopted DV 343-2 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 46 |
2019-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2019-0098h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 46 |
2019-02-28 | House | Special Order to 03/07/2019 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 62 |
2019-02-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0098h (NT) for 02/27/2019 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 31 |
2019-02-05 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/23/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-01-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building208 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 43 |