NH HB263 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-26 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-26 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the lifetime Medicaid limit.
Title
Relative to the lifetime Medicaid limit.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-26 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-10-26 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/1/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-10-11 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/20/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Insurance/Consumer Div Subcom Work Session: 10/6/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-08-23 | House Retained Bill - Insurance/Consumer Div Subcom Work Session: 9/27/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-03-09 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.822 | |
2011-03-01 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-26 | House Public Hearing: 2/3/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-20 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 179 |