NH HB276 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - House Signed By Governor 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - House Signed By Governor 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to wine manufacturers.
Title
Relative to wine manufacturers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | House Signed By Governor 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0165 | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1726 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 19, Pg.539 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 19, Pg.510 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Sen. D’Allesandro Floor Amendment #2011-2254s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.510 | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 6/1/11; Senate Calendar 26 | |
2011-05-12 | Senate Hearing on proposed amendment #1888s to HB 276 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Sen. De Blois Moved Recommit to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Ought to Pass Not Voted On | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/11/11; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Hearing: 4/12/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 11, Pg.191 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.754 | |
2011-03-09 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 15 (Vote 16-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.547 | |
2011-02-24 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-24 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-16 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-09 | House Continued Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 3:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-25 | House Public Hearing: 2/1/2011 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-01-20 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 180 |