NH HB291 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 252-100; House Journal 26, PG.787-790
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 252-100; House Journal 26, PG.787-790
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing certain speed limits to 75 miles per hour.
Title
Increasing certain speed limits to 75 miles per hour.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - House - ITL (Y: 252 N: 100 NV: 20 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 252-100; House Journal 26, PG.787-790 |
2013-03-06 | House | Special Order to Mar 13 Without Objection; House Journal 24, PG.703 |
2013-02-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 22, PG.519 |
2013-02-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 13 (Vote 14-1; Part I, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.519 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG.190 |