NH HB293 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the requirements for filing a chartered public school application.
Title
Relative to the requirements for filing a chartered public school application.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 70 |
2017-02-22 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-02-22 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 12-5; Regular Calendar) |
2017-02-08 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 02/21/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-02-01 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/15/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-12 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/18/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/11/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 7 |