NH HB295 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Lay on Table (Rep. Cannon): Motion Adopted DV 352-3 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 84
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Lay on Table (Rep. Cannon): Motion Adopted DV 352-3 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 84
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to initiating amendments and corrections to birth records.
Title
Relative to initiating amendments and corrections to birth records.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerri Cannon [D] | Rep. Lisa Bunker [D] | Rep. Donald Bouchard [D] | Rep. Gary Woods [D] |
Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Cannon): Motion Adopted DV 352-3 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 84 |
2021-03-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-03-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0608h (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 48 |
2021-03-02 | House | Public Hearing: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following links:1. To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99282187833 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 42 |