NH HB308 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB308
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2727h (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2727h (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a condominium dispute resolution board.
Title
Establishing a condominium dispute resolution board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2727h (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) |
2019-09-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-09-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-09-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-06-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-22 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-01-15 | House | Executive Session: 01/22/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 45 |
Same As/Similar To
HB308 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2727h (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar)