NH HB312 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Lay HB312 on Table (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted DV 316-30 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Lay HB312 on Table (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted DV 316-30 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to petitions for warrant articles at a special meeting.
Title
Relative to petitions for warrant articles at a special meeting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | Lay HB312 on Table (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted DV 316-30 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 20 |
2023-02-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0274h 02/09/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB312 02/09/2023 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 24 |
2023-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 10 |