NH HB315 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-15 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-15 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to appointment of attorneys by judges, marital masters, and judicial officers.
Title
Relative to appointment of attorneys by judges, marital masters, and judicial officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-15 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-09-15 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/4/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-03-03 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.824 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-02-16 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 3/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-26 | House Public Hearing: 2/3/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 11, PG. 182 |