NH HB315 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Conference Committee Report 2566c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 203-142 06/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Interstate Voter Registration Crosscheck Program and the accuracy and efficiency of voter registration systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Interstate Voter Registration Crosscheck Program and the accuracy and efficiency of voter registration systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - Conference Committee Report (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 203 N: 142 NV: 22 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27HouseConference Committee Report 2566c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 203-142 06/27/2019
2019-06-27SenateConference Committee Report # 2019-2566c; Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Adopted; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-20SenateConference Committee Report Filed, # 2019-2566c; 06/27/2019
2019-06-18SenateConferee Change; Senator Sherman Replaces Senator Birdsell; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-18HouseConferee Change: Rep. Cote Replaces Rep. Prudhomme-O'Brien 06/13/2019
2019-06-17HouseConference Committee Meeting: 06/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-06-12SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Levesque, Morgan, Birdsell; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-12SenateSen. Levesque Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-11HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Moynihan, Bergeron, W. Pearson, Prudhomme-O'Brien 06/06/2019
2019-06-11HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2228s and Requests CofC (Rep. Cote): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2228s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-2228s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2228s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
2019-04-18SenateHearing: 04/25/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 19
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0516h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 6
2019-03-07HouseAmendment # 2019-0516h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 6
2019-02-21HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0516h (NT) for 03/07/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 4
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/15/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building308
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 45

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=510&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB315
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=514&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=514
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=514
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=169&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0315&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB315&ddlsponsors=&lsr=510
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=170&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0315&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB315&ddlsponsors=&lsr=510
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=244&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0315&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB315&ddlsponsors=&lsr=510
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=222&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0315&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB315&ddlsponsors=&lsr=510

Bill Comments

feedback