NH HB352 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to merger of lots or parcels.
Title
Relative to merger of lots or parcels.
Sponsors
Sen. John Barnes [R] | Rep. David Bates [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. James Forsythe [R] |
Rep. James Pilliod [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.418 | |
2011-10-14 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 4 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2208 | |
2011-09-14 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/11/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-04-21 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 4/27/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-04-19 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 4/21/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-03-03 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.825 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/3/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Municipal & County Government; House Journal 11, PG. 183 |