NH HB353 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Conference Committee Report, Not Signed Off
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Conference Committee Report, Not Signed Off
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the regulation of private investigators and security guards.
Title
Relative to the regulation of private investigators and security guards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report, Not Signed Off |
2013-06-11 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/13/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 ==TIME CHANGE== |
2013-06-06 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Carson, Soucy |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-29 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Weber, C.McGuire, P.Schmidt, and M.Nelson; House Journal 45, PG.1510 |
2013-05-29 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1390s and Requests C of C (Rep Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 45, PG.1510 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1390s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1390s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1390s, 5/2/13; Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Hearing: 4/24/13, Room 100, State House, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin; Senate Journal 8 |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0613h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.757 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0613h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.757 |
2013-03-06 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0613h; House Calendar 22, PG.545 |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0613h for Mar 13 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.506 |
2013-02-27 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-21 | House | Continued Executive Session: 2/26/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 ==RECESSED== |
2013-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 ==RECESSED== |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.192 |