NH HB356 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-26 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/16/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-26 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/16/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring valid photo identification to vote in person.
Title
Requiring valid photo identification to vote in person.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Barry [R] | Rep. Richard Drisko [R] | Rep. Kathleen Hoelzel [R] | Rep. William Smith [R] |
Rep. Pamela Tucker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-26 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/16/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-09-24 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/4/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-09-21 | House ==CANCELLED== Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/27/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-06-07 | House Referred to Election Law for Interim Study; House Calendar 45, PG.2432 | |
2012-01-05 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Division Vote 300-35; House Journal 8, PG.482 | |
2011-11-02 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 4 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2217 | |
2011-10-19 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/27/2011 Legislative Office Building 308 1:00 PM or Immediately Following Public Hearing | |
2011-10-19 | House Retained Bill - Public Hearing on Proposed Amendment: 10/27/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2011-10-19 | House Retained Bill - Continued Subcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2011-10-19 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/26/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-10-13 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/18/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2011-10-06 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2011 Legislative Office Building 308 1:00 PM Or 30 Minutes After Session | |
2011-09-28 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/5/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2011-09-20 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/28/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 8:30 Amendment)== | |
2011-09-20 | House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/27/2011 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2011-09-01 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/21/2011 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2011-09-01 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/20/2011 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2011-05-10 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/17/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2011-02-22 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.823 | |
2011-02-08 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 ==Executive Session to Follow== | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 11, PG. 183 |