NH HB376 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/20/2023; Chapter 84; Eff: 06/20/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/20/2023; Chapter 84; Eff: 06/20/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the current education, training, and requirements for personnel employed as emergency dispatchers and 911 telecommunicators for police, fire, and emergency medical organizations.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the current education, training, and requirements for personnel employed as emergency dispatchers and 911 telecommunicators for police, fire, and emergency medical organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/20/2023; Chapter 84; Eff: 06/20/2023 |
2023-06-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/08/2023); Senate Journal 19 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/18/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Hearing: 05/02/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 20 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 3 |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/24/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 3 |
2023-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/24/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/09/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 13 |