NH HB380 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-18 - House Vetoed By Governor 07/13/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-18 - House Vetoed By Governor 07/13/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting the commission on the status of men from repeal on June 30, 2011 and adding a duty to the commission.
Title
Exempting the commission on the status of men from repeal on June 30, 2011 and adding a duty to the commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Nevins [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Oligny [R] | Rep. Lawrence Perkins [R] | Rep. Frank Sapareto [R] |
Rep. William Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-18 | House Vetoed By Governor 07/13/2011 | |
2011-06-22 | House Enrolled; House Journal 57, PG.1859 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-22 | House Conference Committee Report #2313c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 57, PG.1845 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2313c; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2011-06-15 | Senate Conference Committee Report #2011-2313c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed | |
2011-06-06 | House Conference Committee Meeting: 6/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Carson, Groen and Larsen; Senate Journal 18, Pg.389 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.389 | |
2011-05-18 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Winter, Hansen, Whitehead, and Bowers; House Journal 44, PG.1531 | |
2011-05-18 | House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1656s and Requests C of C (Rep C.McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1531 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 15, Pg.312 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1656s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 15, Pg.304 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Committee Amendment 1656s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.304 | |
2011-04-28 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1656s, 5/4/11; Senate Calendar 22 | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Hearing: 4/14/11, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration | |
2011-02-23 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.473 | |
2011-02-17 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 23 (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.275 | |
2011-02-14 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2011 Legislative Office Building 306 1:30 PM or 45 Minutes Following House Session | |
2011-01-26 | House Public Hearing: 2/8/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 11, PG. 184 |