NH HB393 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.732
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.732
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the authority for the establishment of certain revolving funds by towns.
Title
Repealing the authority for the establishment of certain revolving funds by towns.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Simard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.732 | |
2011-03-01 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.537 | |
2011-02-15 | House Executive Session: 2/24/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/8/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 11, PG. 185 |