NH HB394 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB394
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304
Pending: House Science, Technology and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304
Pending: House Science, Technology and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study the short and long term impacts of pending national and regional carbon pricing mechanisms on New Hampshires residents, agriculture, wildlife and natural resources-based tourism sector, and commercial enterprises.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the short and long term impacts of pending national and regional carbon pricing mechanisms on New Hampshires residents, agriculture, wildlife and natural resources-based tourism sector, and commercial enterprises.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-09-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-03-10 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96232478698 |
2021-02-25 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/05/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95412375991 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92752912485 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 46 |
Same As/Similar To
HB394 (Carry Over) 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304