NH HB407 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB407
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 166; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 166; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring workers' compensation to cover prophylactic treatment for exposure.
Title
Requiring workers' compensation to cover prophylactic treatment for exposure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 166; Eff. 1/1/2019 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19A |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/17/2018, Room 100, State House, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Introduced 03/22/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0817h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 17 |
2018-03-21 | House | FLAM # 2018-0817h (Rep. Kurk): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 17 |
2018-03-21 | House | Reconsider HB 407 (Rep. Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 16 |
2018-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2453h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 2 |
2018-03-21 | House | Amendment # 2017-2453h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 2 |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0817h for 03/21/2018 (Vote 26-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 3 |
2018-03-15 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/14/2018 Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-03-12 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Division I Work Session: 03/14/2018 10:05 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-03-05 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division I Work Session: 03/13/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-03-02 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-02-06 | House | Division I Work Session: 02/20/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-01-24 | House | Division I Work Session: 01/31/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-01-18 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division I Work Session: 01/23/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building212 |
2018-01-11 | House | ==RECESSED== Division I Work Session: 01/18/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Finance 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 39 |
2018-01-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2453h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 39 |
2018-01-09 | House | Amendment # 2017-2453h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 39 |
2018-01-03 | House | Special Order to 1/9/2018 Without Objection House Journal 1 P. 104 |
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2453h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-09-26 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/05/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-06-08 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 06/20/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-03-01 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2017 Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-02-09 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/15/2017 12:15 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-01-31 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 3 P. 11 |
Same As/Similar To
HB407 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2453h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)