NH HB419 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - House Signed By Governor 06/07/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - House Signed By Governor 06/07/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to language in insurance certificates.
Title
Relative to language in insurance certificates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | House Signed By Governor 06/07/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0137 | |
2011-06-01 | House Enrolled; House Journal 48, PG.1669 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 20, Pg.547 | |
2011-05-18 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1491s (Rep Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1531 | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 14 | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1491s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 14, Pg.275 | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Committee Amendment 1491s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14, Pg.275 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1491s, 4/27/11; Senate Calendar 21 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Hearing: 3/29/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 11, Pg.192 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0709h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.702-703 | |
2011-03-15 | House Amendment #0709h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.702-703 | |
2011-03-10 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0709h; House Calendar 23, PG.619-620 | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0709h for Mar 15 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.525 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-16 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/17/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 185 |