NH HB437 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB437
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-04 - Lay HB437 on Table (Rep. Myler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-04 - Lay HB437 on Table (Rep. Myler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a reading assessment and intervention program.
Title
Relative to a reading assessment and intervention program.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Rep. Joseph Pitre [R] | Rep. Michael Moffett [R] |
Rep. Lorie Ball [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-04 | House | Lay HB437 on Table (Rep. Myler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 103 |
2023-11-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2023-11-17 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 11/13/2023 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 28 |
2023-10-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/31/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 43 |
2023-10-10 | House | Executive Session: 11/13/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-10-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/18/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 40 |
2023-09-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/02/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 36 |
2023-05-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/13/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 16 |
Same As/Similar To
HB437 (Carry Over) 2023-09-05 - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/02/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 36