NH HB443 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 213; Eff: 09/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 213; Eff: 09/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to municipal watering restrictions.
Title
Relative to municipal watering restrictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 213; Eff: 09/10/2019 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1889s (Rep. Carson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 10 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1889s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1889s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1889s, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Hearing: 04/24/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:15 am; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0397h: Motion Adopted DV 220-130 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 17 |
2019-03-20 | House | Amendment # 2019-0397h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 17 |
2019-03-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0698h |
2019-03-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0397h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 30 |
2019-02-15 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 14 |