NH HB444 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 07/15/2011; Chapter 0077
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 07/15/2011; Chapter 0077
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the commemoration of General John Stark Day.
Title
Relative to the commemoration of General John Stark Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 07/15/2011; Chapter 0077 | |
2011-05-04 | House Enrolled; House Journal 42, PG.1490 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 16, Pg.318 | |
2011-04-27 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1361s (Rep C.McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.1352 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 12, Pg.255 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1361s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12, Pg.252 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Committee Amendment 1361s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12, Pg.252 | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1361s, 4/13/11; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Hearing: 4/5/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 18 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 11, Pg.192 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0590h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.803-804 | |
2011-03-15 | House Amendment #0590h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.803-804 | |
2011-03-10 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0590h (New Title); House Calendar 23, PG.635 | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0590h(NT) for Mar 15 (Vote 12-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.554 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-02-02 | House Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-02-02 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 3/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 11, PG. 186 |