NH HB445 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 217-150; House Journal 24, PG. 808-810
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 217-150; House Journal 24, PG. 808-810
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining poker as a game of skill.
Title
Defining poker as a game of skill.
Sponsors
Rep. James Spillane [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Kyle Tasker [R] | Rep. Amanda Bouldin [D] |
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] | Rep. Eric Eastman [R] | Rep. Joe Duarte [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 217 N: 150 NV: 30 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 217-150; House Journal 24, PG. 808-810 |
2015-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 409 |
2015-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 2/18/2015 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-05 | House | Continued Public Hearing: 2/13/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-05 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/13/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG. 224 |