NH HB446 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-27 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 4, Pg.54
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-27 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 4, Pg.54
Summary
Defining "unnecessary hardship" for purposes of zoning variances.
Title
Defining "unnecessary hardship" for purposes of zoning variances.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-27 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 4, Pg.54 | |
2010-01-20 | Senate Committee Report; Inexpedient to Legislate 1/27/10; Senate Calendar 4 | |
2009-06-03 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.513 | |
2009-06-03 | Senate Without Objection, Chair moved to Special-Order HB 446 to the front of the Calendar; Senate Journal 18, Pg.398 | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Committee Report; Rereferred to Committee [06/03/09]; Senate Calendar 26 | |
2009-05-14 | Senate Hearing; === RECONVENE === May 21, 2009, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:10 a.m.; Senate Calendar 24 | |
2009-05-14 | Senate Hearing; === RECESSED === May 14, 2009 Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 24 | |
2009-04-30 | Senate Hearing; May 14 , 2009, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 22 | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 8, pg. 134 | |
2009-03-11 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0088h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.796-797 | |
2009-03-11 | House Amendment #0088h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.796-797 | |
2009-02-20 | House Proposed Amendment #0088h; House Calendar 19, PG.537 | |
2009-02-20 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0088h for Mar 11 Consent Calendar (vote 14-0); House Calendar 19, PG.503 | |
2009-02-18 | House ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 2/19/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 (Orig 2:00 PM) | |
2009-01-29 | House Public Hearing: 2/5/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2009-01-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG.228 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=110&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |