NH HB450 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 16, Pg.327
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 16, Pg.327
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the regulatory authority of the board of barbering, cosmetology, and esthetics.
Title
Relative to the regulatory authority of the board of barbering, cosmetology, and esthetics.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bates [R] | Rep. Spec Bowers [R] | Sen. Jim Luther [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
Rep. Dan McGuire [R] | Sen. Raymond White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 16, Pg.327 | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/11/11; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Hearing: === RECONVENE === 4/21/11, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 20 | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Hearing: === RECESSED === 4/14/11, Room 100, State House, 10:10 a.m.; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Hearing: 4/14/11, Room 100, State House, 10:10 a.m.; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 11, Pg.192 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0716h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.804 | |
2011-03-15 | House Amendment #0716h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.804 | |
2011-03-10 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0716h; House Calendar 23, PG.635 | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0716h for Mar 15 (Vote 15-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.554 | |
2011-03-08 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-03-08 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/9/2011 12:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-03-01 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 3/2/2011 Legislative Office Building 306 2:00 PM or 45 Minutes After House Session | |
2011-03-01 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/2/2011 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-02-16 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/24/2011 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-02-09 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 1:15 PM Representative's Hall | |
2011-02-02 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Executive Departments & Administration; House Journal 11, PG. 187 |