NH HB452 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2017 House Journal 11 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2017 House Journal 11 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the office of the business advocate in the department of resources and economic development and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing the office of the business advocate in the department of resources and economic development and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - OTPA (Y: 220 N: 113 NV: 30 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2017 House Journal 11 P. 6 |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/23/2017 (Vote 25-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 3 |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-02-21 | House | Division I Work Session: 02/28/2017 11:20 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Finance 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 43 |
2017-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0338h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 220-113 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 41 |
2017-02-15 | House | Amendment #2017-0338h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 41 |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0338h for 02/15/2017 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 21 |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 13 |