NH HB478 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.758
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.758
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the department of health and human services to license supervised visitation centers.
Title
Requiring the department of health and human services to license supervised visitation centers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.758 |
2013-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 13 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.506 |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 2/26/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-13 | House | Public Hearing: 2/21/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.197 |