NH HB478 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB478
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-08 - Executive Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-08 - Executive Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to treatment of PFAScontaminants in thedrinking water of the Merrimack Village Water District.
Title
Relative to treatment of PFAScontaminants in thedrinking water of the Merrimack Village Water District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-08 | House | Executive Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-03-16 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Executive Session: 03/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95164452682 |
2021-03-05 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link: To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97676008758 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-05 | House | Vacated and Referred to Judiciary (): Motion Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 01/06/2021 House Journal 2 P. 58 |
2021-01-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/17/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93611943701 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 49 |
Same As/Similar To
HB478 (Carry Over) 2021-09-08 - Executive Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208