NH HB486 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 170; Eff: 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 170; Eff: 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to department of corrections procedures concerning the requirement for restoration of the voting rights of felons.
Title
Relative to department of corrections procedures concerning the requirement for restoration of the voting rights of felons.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Klein-Knight [D] | Rep. Donald Bouchard [D] | Rep. Cam Kenney [D] | Rep. Manny Espitia [D] |
Rep. Amanda Bouldin [D] | Rep. Joshua Query [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 170; Eff: 09/08/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/11/2019, Room 103, State House, 02:40 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; Senate Calendar 17A |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0361h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 17 |
2019-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2019-0361h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 17 |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0361h for 03/07/2019 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 8 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 16 |