NH HB487 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB487
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a registry for the deaf, hard of hearing, and deaf/blind in the department of health and human services.
Title
Establishing a registry for the deaf, hard of hearing, and deaf/blind in the department of health and human services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/08/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 04/25/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing: 04/03/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0674h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 7 |
2019-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2019-0674h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 7 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0674h for 03/07/2019 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 5 |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-02-20 | House | Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-02-13 | House | Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/19/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 16 |
Same As/Similar To
HB487 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14