NH HB495 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 241; Effective Date 9/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 241; Effective Date 9/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to commercial referral fees.
Title
Relative to commercial referral fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 241; Effective Date 9/11/2015 |
2015-06-29 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2139 |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1837s (Rep Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG. 1988 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1837s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1837s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1837s, New Title, 5/28/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Hearing: 4/21/15, Room 100, State House, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 835 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 11 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 415 |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 226 |