NH HB496 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB496
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/14/2020; Chapter 10; Eff: 07/14/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/14/2020; Chapter 10; Eff: 07/14/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of antique snowmobiles, relative to water quality rules, and relative to the disposition of administrative fines for asbestos management violations.
Title
Relative to the definition of antique snowmobiles, relative to water quality rules, and relative to the disposition of administrative fines for asbestos management violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/14/2020; Chapter 10; Eff: 07/14/2020 |
2020-07-06 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 70 |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Backus): Motion Adopted DV 206-128 06/11/2020 House Journal 9 P. 38 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Special Order to the end of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2875s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-2875s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2875s, 01/08/2020; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Hearing: 11/20/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm, on proposed amendment # 2019-2863s; Senate Calendar 43 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/23/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 103, State House, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0497h (NT): Motion Adopted DV 196-137 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 36 |
2019-03-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0497h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 36 |
2019-03-07 | House | Special Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection House Journal 8 P. 60 |
2019-02-21 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-21 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0497h (NT) for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 19 |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 02/19/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 17 |
Same As/Similar To
HB496 (Carry Over) 2019-11-21 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2875s