NH HB504 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB504
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Relative to the state education property tax and the low and moderate income homeowners property tax relief program.
Title
Relative to the state education property tax and the low and moderate income homeowners property tax relief program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study HB504-FN-LOCAL 09/28/2021 (Vote 24-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 18 |
2021-08-18 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-08-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/07/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/03/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92309184005 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94528213728 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/17/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98448475898 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 51 |
Same As/Similar To
HB504 (Carry Over) 2021-08-18 - ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=628&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB504 |