NH HB508 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to idling by diesel locomotives.
Title
Relative to idling by diesel locomotives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/23/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 4/2/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation |
2013-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0424h: Motion Adopted Division Vote 211-128; House Journal 27, PG.889-890 |
2013-03-20 | House | Amendment #0424h: Amendment Adopted Division Vote 208-128; House Journal 27, PG.889-890 |
2013-03-06 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 23 PG.596-597 |
2013-03-06 | House | Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2013-0424h; House Calendar 23 PG.618 |
2013-03-06 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0424h for Mar 20 (Vote 12-7; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.596-597 |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 12, PG.198 |