NH HB520 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Sen. Odell Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Sen. Odell Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study implementing Keno in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a committee to study implementing Keno in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Russell Ober [R] | Rep. Robert Theberge [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
Rep. Mary Griffin [R] | Rep. Andrew Renzullo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Odell Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1862s, New Title, Not Voted On |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1862s, New Title, 5/30/13; Senate Calendar 22 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Hearing: 5/14/13, Room 103, State House, 9:45 a.m. Proposed non-germane amendment to HB 520 #2013-1604s; Senate Calendar 20 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.664 |
2013-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought To Pass for Mar 6 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 20, PG.414 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 3:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG.198 |