NH HB520 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Shall House Consider: Motion Failed DV 157-204 lacking necessary two-thirds vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Shall House Consider: Motion Failed DV 157-204 lacking necessary two-thirds vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to right to work.
Title
Relative to right to work.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Shall House Consider: Motion Failed DV 157-204 lacking necessary two-thirds vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 41 |
2017-02-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-02-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 14-7; Regular Calendar) |
2017-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2017 Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2017 10:05 am Representatives Hall |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 3 P. 17 |