NH HB523 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making various changes to the fish and game laws.
Title
Making various changes to the fish and game laws.
Sponsors
Sen. David Boutin [R] | Rep. Jennifer Coffey [R] | Rep. Guy Comtois [R] | Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Kreis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources; House Journal 11, PG. 189 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/error.htm?aspxerrorpath=/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx |
Text | https://www.gencourt.state.nh.us/legislation/2011/HB0523.html |