NH HB531 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the minimum gross business income required for filing a business profits tax return.
Title
Increasing the minimum gross business income required for filing a business profits tax return.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/18/2017; Senate Calendar 23 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/05/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0193h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 21 |
2017-02-15 | House | Amendment #2017-0193h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 21 |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0193h for 02/15/2017 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 16 |
2017-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2017 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 17 |