NH HB533 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB533
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to political advocacy organizations.
Title
Relative to political advocacy organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Rep. Robert Backus [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] |
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Patricia Lovejoy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-16 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-05 | House | Executive Session: 10/19/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-10-05 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-10-04 | House | ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-02-24 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 02/21/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-01-26 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/26/2017 11:20 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 17 |
Same As/Similar To
HB533 (Carry Over) 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)